EP2453030 - A method for repairing/refurbishing/creating a turbine engine component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szela, Edward R. 108 Squassick Road West Springfield Massachusetts 01089 / US | 02 /
Bales, Daniel A. 2 Sconsett Bluff Avon Connecticut 06001 / US | 03 /
Cetel, Alan D. 90 Fuller Drive West Hartford Connecticut 06117 / US | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/20] | 01 /
Szela, Edward R. 108 Squassick Road West Springfield, MA Massachusetts MA 01089 / US | ||
02 /
Bales, Daniel A. 2 Sconsett Bluff Avon, CT Connecticut CT 06001 / US | |||
03 /
Cetel, Alan D. 90 Fuller Drive West Hartford, CT Connecticut CT06117 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns 10 Salisbury Square London Greater London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11188340.1 | 08.11.2011 | [2012/20] | Priority number, date | US20100411072P | 08.11.2010 Original published format: US 411072 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453030 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/00, C23C4/18, C23C28/02, C22C19/07, B23P6/00, C23C10/00, C23C30/00, C23C28/00, C22C19/05, F01D5/28, C23C24/04, F01D5/00 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B23P6/007 (EP,US);
B23P6/045 (US);
B23K1/0018 (US);
B23K10/027 (US);
B23K26/34 (US);
B23K31/02 (US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,US);
B23K35/3046 (EP,US);
B23K9/04 (US);
C22C19/03 (EP,US);
C22C19/057 (EP,US);
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
C23C28/02 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C23C4/01 (EP,US);
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
F01D5/12 (US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F01D9/02 (US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (EP,US);
F05D2220/30 (US);
F05D2230/31 (US);
F05D2230/40 (US);
F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | C22C19/05, C22C19/07, B23P6/00, C23C10/00, C23C28/00, C23C30/00, F01D5/00, F01D5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reparieren/Neuausstatten/Erzeugen eines Turbinenmotorbauteils | [2012/20] | English: | A method for repairing/refurbishing/creating a turbine engine component | [2012/20] | French: | Procédé pour réparer/rénover/créer un élément de moteur de turbine | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 12.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5443789 (HARRIS KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1; 2; 3, lines 42-51; 4-5; 17-30 *; | [Y]EP0676489 (CANNON MUSKEGON CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, lines 26-34 *; | [Y]US2002006524 (JASLIER YANN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0033] - [ 0060] , [ 0063]; claims 1-2 *; | [A]US2003167636 (BOSE SUDHANGSHU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1371439 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1995346 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019]; claims 1, 12 * |