EP2466635 - Semiconductor circuit assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmair, Markus Friedrich-Würth Str. 20 91154 Roth / DE | 02 /
Mauer, Peter Kieler Str. 39 90766 Fürth / DE | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/25] | Application number, filing date | 11188735.2 | 11.11.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | DE20101063220 | 16.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010063220 | [2012/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2466635 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/049, H01L23/48 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
H01L23/049 (EP);
H01L23/48 (EP);
H01L2224/49175 (EP);
H01L24/49 (EP);
H01L25/072 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP);
H01L2924/13055 (EP);
H01L2924/16195 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbleiterschaltungsanordnung | [2012/25] | English: | Semiconductor circuit assembly | [2012/25] | French: | Agencement de commutation semi-conducteur | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE102004025609 | DE102006006421 | WO2004102806 | DE20101035980 |