EP2592477 - Continuous process for preparation of a substrate with a relief structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Dutch Polymer Institute Kennispoort John F. Kennedylaan 2 5612 AB Eindhoven / NL | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Renkema, Jaap IPecunia Patents B.V. P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | [2013/20] | Application number, filing date | 11189018.2 | 14.11.2011 | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592477 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/36, G03F7/027, G03F7/38 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
G03F7/027 (EP);
G03F7/033 (EP);
G03F7/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Durchgehendes Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Substrats mit Reliefsstruktur | [2013/20] | English: | Continuous process for preparation of a substrate with a relief structure | [2013/20] | French: | Procédé continu pour la préparation d'un substrat avec une structure en relief | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2013/43] | 15.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006051484 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,11 * page 2, lines 23-31 * * page 7, lines 1-4 * * pages 11-14; figure 3; claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO2008151915 (STICHTING DUTCH POLYMER INST [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 3; claims 1-15 * * pages 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2008025508 (STITCHING DUTCH POLYMER INST [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 8, lines 9-29; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]EP2109005 (STICHTING DUTCH POLYMER INST [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0010]; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO2004021088 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, lines 27-34 *; | [Y] - WITZ DE C ET AL, "PHOTO-EMBOSSING AS A TOOL FOR CREATING COMPLEX SURFACE RELIEF STRUCTURES", POLYMER PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030801), vol. 44, no. 2, ISSN 0032-3934, page 236/237, XP008044116 [Y] 1-15 * pages 236,237 * | [Y] - CARLOS SANCHEZ, "Photoembossing of periodic relief structures using polymerization-induced diffusion: A combinatorial study", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2005), vol. 17, pages 2567 - 2571, XP009155432 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200500777 | [Y] - MIAN DAI, "Formation of relief structures on fibres by photo-embossing", JOURNALS OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (20110825), vol. 21, pages 15527 - 15531, XP009155473 [Y] 1-15 * page 15527 - page 15531 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1jm12365c | by applicant | WO0018696 | - N. STUTZMANN, T.A. TERVOORT, C.W.M. BASTIAANSEN, K. FELDMAN, P. SMITH, ADV. MATER., (200012), page 557 | - G. FICHET, N. STUTZMANN, B.V.O.MUIR, W.T.S.HUCK, ADV.MATER., (2002), vol. 14, page 47 | - E. KIM, Y.N.XIA, G.M.WHITESIDES, NATURE, (1995), vol. 376, page 581 | - C. SANCHEZ, B-J. DE GANS, D. KOZODAEV, A. ALEXEEV, M.J.ESCUTI, C. VAN HEESCH, T. BEL, U.S.SCHUBERT, C.W.M.BASTIAANSEN, D.J.BROER, ADV. MATER., (2005), vol. 17, pages 2567 - 2571 | - S.H. AHN, L.J. GUO, "high-speed roll-to-roll nanoimprint lithography on flexible plastic substrates", ADV. MATER., (2008), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1002/adma.200702650, pages 2044 - 2049, XP055024725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200702650 | - D.XIA, Z.KU, S.C.LEE, S.R.J.BRUEK, ADV. MATER., (2011), vol. 23, page 147 | - M. HALBEISEN, H. SCHIFT, CHEMICAL-FIBRES-INTERNATIONAL, (2004), vol. 54, page 378 | - K. HERMANS, F. K. WOLF, J. PERELAER, R. A. J. JANSSEN, U. S. SCHUBERT, C. W. M. BASTIAANSEN, APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 91, page 1 | - C. SANCHEZ, B. GANS, D. KOZODAEV, A. ALEXEEV, M. J. ESCUTI, C. HEESCH, T. BEL, U. S. SCHUBERT, C. W. M. BASTIAANSEN, D. J. BROER, ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2005), vol. 17, page 2567 | - M. DAI, O. T. PICOT, N. F. HUGHES-BRITTAIN, T. PEIJS, C. W. M. BASTIAANSEN, J. MATER. CHEM., (2011), vol. 21, no. 39, pages 15527 - 15531 | - C. SANCHEZ, B.-J. DE GANS, D. KOZODAEV, A. ALEXEEV, M. J. ESCUTTI, C. VAN HEESCH, T. BEL, U. S. SCHUBERT, C. W. M. BASTIAANSEN, D., ADV. MATER., (2005), vol. 17, page 2567 |