EP2450810 - Method for extracting information from a database [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QlikTech International AB Scheelevägen 24-26 223 63 Lund / SE | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolgé, Håkan Terminsvägen 14 SE-224 67 Lund / SE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Hansson Thyresson AB PO Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Persson, Albin, et al Hansson Thyresson Patentbyra AB Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 11189942.3 | 10.03.2000 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | SE19990000894 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9900894 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2450810 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2450810 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/28 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G06F16/284 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2012/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Extrahieren von Informationen aus einer Datenbank | [2012/19] | English: | Method for extracting information from a database | [2012/19] | French: | Procédé pour extraire des informations d'une base de données | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00917562.1 / EP1177512 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000917562) is 23.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 08.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 09.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 20 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 20   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - GRAEFE G, "Query evaluation techniques for large databases", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19930601), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1145/152610.152611, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 73 - 170, XP002306867 [I] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/152610.152611 |