EP2479789 - Photovoltaic device and method for making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Solar Malaysia SDN.BHD No 8, Jalan Hi-Tech 3/3 Zon Industri Fasa 3 Kulim Hi-Tech Park, 09000 Kulim Kedah Darul Aman / MY | [2014/04] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sulima, Oleg General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bulding K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Tsakalakos, Loucas General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Wei, Ching-Yeu General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bulding K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 04 /
Srivastava, Alok Mani General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 05 /
Halverson, Adam Fraser General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Thurston, Joanna, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Thurston, Joanna, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/30] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11190197.1 | 22.11.2011 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | US20100956811 | 30.11.2010 Original published format: US 956811 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2479789 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2479789 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/142, H01L31/0232, H01L31/055, H01L31/052, H01L31/073 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H01L31/055 (EP,US);
H01L31/046 (EP,US);
H01L31/056 (EP,US);
H01L31/073 (EP,US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US);
Y02E10/543 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H01L27/142, H01L31/0232, H01L31/055 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fotovoltaische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2012/30] | English: | Photovoltaic device and method for making | [2012/30] | French: | Dispositif photovoltaïque et procédé de fabrication | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 09.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 30.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2018 | 21.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001094129 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,7,11-13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009050201 (FORTMANN CHARLES M [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0056]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2010147363 (HUANG LEE-MAY [TW], et al) [X] 1,14* paragraphs [0049] - [0056]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US20100894901 | US20100894916 | US20100894926 |