EP2597876 - Interlaced 3D video [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Haan, Wiebe P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11190435.5 | 24.11.2011 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2597876 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, G09G5/00, H04L29/08, H04N21/4363, H04N21/41, H04N21/4402 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,RU,US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US);
G09G5/12 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,RU,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,RU,US);
H04N21/43632 (EP,US);
H04N21/440263 (EP,US);
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
G09G2340/14 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
G09G2370/047 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verschachteltes 3D-Video | [2013/22] | English: | Interlaced 3D video | [2013/22] | French: | Vidéos 3D entrelacées | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0910088 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0026] *; | [I]EP1617370 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1,10,12,13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]US2006059227 (ZIMLER RANDY [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2008031515 (BAE HYUNG-JIN [KR], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] *; | [IY]US2009284652 (BENNETT JAMES D [CZ], et al) [I] 1,2,4-14 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * [Y] 3; | [I]US2011141236 (MITANI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,10,12,13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [I]WO2011084169 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [I] 1,10,12,13 * page 15, line 10 - line 33 * * page 17, line 6 - line 22 * * page 19, line 3 - line 11 * * page 20, line 9 - line 27 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "High-Definition Multimedia Interface Specification Version 1.4a Extraction of 3D Signaling Portion", HDMI SPECIFICATION, (20100304), pages 1 - 28, XP002677171 [A] 1,10,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | - HIGH-DEFINITION MULTIMEDIA INTERFACE, SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.4A, EXTRACTION OF 3D SIGNALING PORTION, (20100304), URL: http://www.hdmi.org |