EP2474671 - Height-adjustable street cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G+W GmbH Gas- und Wasserarmaturen aus Kunststoff Industriestrasse 4 74933 Neidenstein / DE | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dörfer, Horst In der Au 8/2 74931 Lobbach / DE | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11191156.6 | 29.11.2011 | [2012/28] | Priority number, date | DE20111008189 | 10.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011008189 | [2012/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2474671 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2474671 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474671 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14, E03B9/10 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
E02D29/1409 (EP);
E03B9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | E02D29/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2012/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Höhenverstellbare Straßenkappe | [2012/28] | English: | Height-adjustable street cap | [2012/28] | French: | Couvercle de chaussée réglable en hauteur | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 04.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2011 | AL | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | IE | 29.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | FR | 06.01.2020 | BG | 06.02.2020 | GB | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
FR | 06.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE10261338 (GULDNER MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * figures 1,2a,2b,4,8,10; claim - * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0062] * [Y] 1-13 [I] 4,8,9,13; | [XYI]DE10334989 (BUDERUS GUSS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1-3; claim - * [Y] 12 [I] 2-4,7-9,11,13; | [Y]DE202008000463U (DREISIGACKER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 12* paragraph [0012]; figures 1-3 *; | [YD]DE102007045051 (HOFMANN WOLFGANG [DE]) [YD] 1-13 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2928386 (GIRARD RENE [FR]) [Y] 1,6-9,11,12 * figures 4,5 * | by applicant | DE202008012318U |