EP2600371 - Switch suitable for direct current operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Industries GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerving, Karsten Agnesstrasse 60 53225 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Lang, Volker Goddardstr. 52 53125 Bonn / DE | 03 /
Meissner, Johannes Naheweg 2 53129 Bonn / DE | 04 /
Thar, Ralf Ankerstr. 34 53757 St. Augustin / DE | 05 /
Dedenbach, Guido Hofstrasse 7 53175 Bonn / DE | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Leadbetter, Benedict Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Patent Law Department Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges VD / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Leadbetter, Benedict Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Patent Law Department Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges VD / CH | Application number, filing date | 11191216.8 | 29.11.2011 | [2013/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2600371 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/36, H01H9/44 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H01H9/36 (EP,US);
H01H33/04 (US);
H01H9/443 (EP,US);
H01H1/20 (EP,US);
H01H50/546 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaltgerät geeignet für einen Gleichstrombetrieb | [2013/23] | English: | Switch suitable for direct current operation | [2013/23] | French: | Appareil de commutation pour un fonctionnement à courant continu | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1640804 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-15 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,8; | [XAI]EP0473013 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * column 3, line 46 - column 11, line 4; figures 2,6,7,10 * [A] 2-4 [I] 8; | [XAI]EP0473014 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * figures 4,5,7,10,11 * [A] 2-4 [I] 8; | [XDA]EP2061053 (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,2,5-7,9-12,14,15 * the whole document *[A] 3,4,8,13 | by applicant | EP2061053 |