EP2444008 - Surgical staples having compressible or crushable members for securing tissue therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/17] | Surgical staples having compressible or crushable members for securing tissue therein and stapling instruments for deploying the same | ||
[2015/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo, PR 00969 / US | [2017/18] |
Former [2017/17] | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Christopher J. 1704 E. Mcmillan Street Cincinnati, OH 45206 / US | 02 /
Morgan, Jerome R. 3275 S. Whitetree Circle Cincinnati, OH 45236 / US | 03 /
Weisenburgh II, William B. 974 Airymeadows Drive Maineville, OH 45039 / US | 04 /
Voegele, James W. 11486 Kemperknoll Road Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 05 /
Ortiz, Mark S. 1145 Glen Echo Lane Milford, OH 45150 / US | 06 /
Stokes, Michael J. 8 Sleepy Hollow Lane Cincinnati, OH 45244 / US | 07 /
Shurtleff, Carl 4735 Medallion Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | 08 /
Shelton IV, Frederick E. P.O. Box 373 New Vienna, OH 45159 / US | 09 /
Swayze, Jeffrey S. 7047 Birchley Drive Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/18] |
Former [2012/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11191409.9 | 08.08.2007 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20060541123 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 541123 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2444008 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2444008 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444008 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/064, // A61B17/072, A61B17/115, A61B17/10 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/105 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00128 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00831 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00862 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07228 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2932 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2943 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2090/032 (EP,US);
A61B2090/036 (EP,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2012/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgische Klammern mit komprimierbaren oder verformbaren Elementen zur Sicherung von Gewebe darin | [2015/10] | English: | Surgical staples having compressible or crushable members for securing tissue therein | [2015/10] | French: | Agrafes chirurgicales dotées d'éléments compressibles ou écrasables pour y fixer les tissus | [2015/10] |
Former [2012/17] | Chirurgische Klammern mit komprimierbaren oder verformbaren Elementen zur Sicherung von Gewebe darin und Klammerinstrumente dafür | ||
Former [2012/17] | Surgical staples having compressible or crushable members for securing tissue therein and stapling instruments for deploying the same | ||
Former [2012/17] | Agrafes chirurgicales dotées d'éléments compressibles ou écrasables pour y fixer les tissus et instruments d'agrafage les utilisant | Examination procedure | 06.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 30.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07836594.7 / EP2079371 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070836594) is 20.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2007 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IE | 08.08.2017 | LU | 08.08.2017 | MT | 08.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
MT | 08.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
MT | 08.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
MT | 08.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
MT | 08.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0594148 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6-8; | [XYI]US2005080454 (DREWS MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * figures 1,20,21,28-33 * * paragraphs [0060] , [0075] - [0077] * [Y] 2,6-8 [I] 2; | [Y]WO2005115253 (REX MEDICAL LP [US]) [Y] 6,7 * page 13, line 16 - page 21, line 21; figures 10F-R *; | [XYI]US2006020336 (LIDDICOAT JOHN R [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8 * paragraphs [0089] - [0106]; figures 14-19 * [Y] 2 [I] 2; | [XP]EP1728473 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [XP] 1-5,8* paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0020] - [0021]; figures 4-9 * | by applicant | US5104025 | US5309927 | US6978921 | US20050216562 | US20050231456 | US20060343562 | US20060344020 | US20060475412 | US20060497868 |