EP2463334 - Method for curing a silicone resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inafuku, Kenichi c/o Silicone-Electronics Materials, Research Center of Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 02 /
Wakao, Miyuki c/o Silicone-Electronics Materials, Research Center of Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 03 /
Kashiwagi, Tsutomu c/o Silicone-Electronics Materials, Research Center of Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi, Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11191488.3 | 01.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | JP20100272521 | 07.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010272521 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463334 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2463334 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/56, C08G77/20, G02B1/04 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (KR);
B29D11/00442 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (KR);
C08J3/28 (KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/70 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Härten einer Siliciumharzzusammensetzung | [2012/24] | English: | Method for curing a silicone resin composition | [2012/24] | French: | Procédé pour le durcissement d'une composition de résine de silicone | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 23.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2011 | AL | 27.03.2013 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | SM | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | RS | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | IE | 01.12.2013 | LU | 01.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 01.12.2011 | |
AT | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
RS | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 01.12.2011 | |
AT | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
RS | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.12.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
LU | 01.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2010047646 (MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MAT INC) [X] 8,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0047]; example -; claim - * [A] 1-7 | by applicant | JP2009235265 | JP2010047646 |