EP2464196 - Heatable cooking chamber insert and cooking device with at least one microwave source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bally, Ingo Dorfstr. 2a 83278 Traunstein / DE | 02 /
Sorg, Matthias Ahornweg 7 83379 Wonneberg / DE | 03 /
Zschau, Günter Am Frauenbrunn 11 83374 Traunwalchen / DE | 04 /
Blumenthal, Peter Gmelchstr. 24 83278 Traunstein / DE | 05 /
Dinkel, Alexander Niederfeldweg 3a 83246 Unterwoessen / DE | 06 /
Fuchs, Wolfgang Färberstraße 4 83352 Altenmarkt a.d. Alz / DE | 07 /
Leitmeyr, Claudia Traunring 10 83301 Traunreut / DE | 08 /
Namberger, Angelika Hauptstr. 16 83352 Altenmarkt a.d. Alz / DE | 09 /
Reindl, Michael Nagelschmiedgasse 18a 84137 Vilsbiburg / DE | 10 /
Roch, Klemens Mozartstr. 11 83308 Trostberg / DE | 11 /
Schnell, Wolfgang Fritz-Bechtold-Str. 7 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 11191666.4 | 02.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | DE20101062500 | 07.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010062500 | [2012/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464196 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464196 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/64, F24C15/16, B65D81/34 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H05B6/6491 (EP);
H05B6/6408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2012/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Beheizbarer Garraumeinsatz und Gargerät mit mindestens einer Mikrowellenquelle | [2012/24] | English: | Heatable cooking chamber insert and cooking device with at least one microwave source | [2012/24] | French: | Insert d'espace de cuisson pouvant être chauffé et appareil de cuisson doté d'au moins une source de micro-ondes | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2011 | AL | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | AT | 02.12.2016 | IE | 02.12.2016 | LU | 02.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 02.12.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
AT | 02.12.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.12.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
AT | 02.12.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.12.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
AT | 02.12.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
AT | 02.12.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0198500 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 4,6 * column 7, line 4 - line 49; figures 5-7 * [I] 1; | [XI]EP0200100 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 1 - line 20; figures 7-10 * [I] 4; | [A]GB2267339 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 2 - page 3; figure . *; | [XI]FR2848289 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE]) [X] 1 * page 6 - page 7; figures 1-3 * [I] 4; | [A]EP1460342 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-3,7,9 * |