EP2457448 - Coffee cherry cosmetic composition and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDF Futureceuticals, Inc. 819 Dixie Highway Momence, IL 60954 / US | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miljkovic, Dusan 4655 Ramsay Avenue San Diego, CA California 92122 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11191721.7 | 03.11.2004 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | US20040560865P | 08.04.2004 Original published format: US 560865 P | US20040618900P | 12.10.2004 Original published format: US 618900 P | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2457448 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2457448 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457448 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61Q5/02, A61K8/9789, A61K36/74 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
A61K36/74 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/365 (KR);
A61K8/60 (KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | A61K8/9783 | ||
Former IPC [2015/16] | A23F5/00, A61K8/97, A61Q19/00, A61Q5/02, A61K36/74, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/08 | ||
Former IPC [2012/22] | A23F5/00, A61K8/97, A61Q19/00, A61Q5/02, A61K36/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzungen aus Kaffeekirschen und Verfahren | [2012/22] | English: | Coffee cherry cosmetic composition and methods | [2012/22] | French: | Procédés et compositions cosmétiqués à base du fruit du caféier | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 14.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04800685.2 / EP1753387 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040800685) is 16.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2004 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | GB | 03.11.2020 | IE | 03.11.2020 | LU | 03.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | FR | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.11.2004 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 03.11.2020 | ||
IE | 03.11.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 03.11.2020 | ||
IE | 03.11.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 03.11.2020 | ||
IE | 03.11.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 03.11.2020 | ||
IE | 03.11.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 03.11.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 03.11.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 06.05.2020 | |
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1533371 (T.N. SCEOPUL) [X] 1,3-10 * page 1, column 1, lines 12, 14 * * page 1, column 2, line 7 - line 9 * * page 1, column 2, line 14 - line 20 * * page 2, column 1, line 31 - line 33 * * example 1 *; | [X]WO02085397 (ONCOLOGY SCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * page 1, line 19 - line 25 * * examples 1-6 *; | [XD]US2002187239 (MILJKOVIC DUSAN [US], et al) [XD] 1-7,9,10 * examples 1,2 *; | [E]WO2004098303 (VDF FUTURECEUTICALS [US], et al) [E] 1-7,9,10 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 4 *; | [X] - COLEMAN R J ET AL, "Pectic acid from the mucilage of coffee cherries", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 59, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0003-9861(55)90472-0, ISSN 0003-9861, (19551101), pages 157 - 164, (19551101), XP024808673 [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * page 157, paragraph 2 * * page 158, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(55)90472-0 | [A] - BUCHELI P ET AL, "RESEARCH ON THE ORIGIN, AND ON THE IMPACT OF POST-HARVEST HANDLING AND MANUFACTURING ON THE PRESENCE OF OCHRATOXIN A IN COFFEE", FOOD ADDITIVES AND CONTAMINANTS, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, LONDON, GB, (20020101), vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1080/02652030110113816, ISSN 0265-203X, pages 655 - 665, XP009063327 [A] 1-10 * page 659, column 1, line 10 - line 20 * * page 659, column 2, line 23 - line 27 * * page 660, column 1, line 26 - line 29 * * page 661, column 2, line 4 - line 8 * * page 663, column 1, line 25 - line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02652030110113816 | by applicant | WO02062159 | US2002187239 | US2004054534 | - ERNEST W. FLICK, Cosmetic and Toiletry Formulations; 2nd edition,, NOYES PUBLICATIONS, (20000115), vol. 8 | - BISPO M.S. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. SCI., (200201), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 45 - 8 | - NAKAKUKI, H. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. A., (19990702), vol. 848, no. 1-2, pages 523 - 7 |