EP2471486 - Registration of 3D measuring data for jaw models in a sub-cranial coordinate system with the aid of a computer-supported registration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/27] | ... | ||
[2014/31] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lampalzer, Ralf Düppelstrasse 54 44789 Bochum / DE | For all designated states Fuhrmann, Frank Luerwald 12 59519 Moehnesee / DE | For all designated states Friemel, Jörg Alte Uemminger Strasse 10 44892 Bochum / DE | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lampalzer, Ralf Dueppelstrasse 54 44789 Bochum / DE | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert Josephsburgstrasse 88 A 81673 München / DE | [2014/36] |
Former [2014/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/27] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11192056.7 | 06.12.2011 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | EP20100015321 | 06.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10015321 | EP20110002329 | 22.03.2011 Original published format: EP 11002329 | [2012/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2471486 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2471486 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61C9/00, A61C7/00 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61C9/0053 (EP,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C7/002 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Registrierung von 3D-Messdaten von Kiefermodellen in einem schaedelbasisbezogenen Koordinatensystem mit Hilfe eines computergestuetzten Registriersystems | [2012/27] | English: | Registration of 3D measuring data for jaw models in a sub-cranial coordinate system with the aid of a computer-supported registration system | [2014/31] | French: | Enregistrement de données de mesure en 3D de modèles de mâchoires dans un système de coordonnées lié à la base du crâne à l'aide d'un système d'enregistrement assisté par ordinateur | [2012/27] |
Former [2012/27] | ... | Examination procedure | 05.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2006015809 (HEIKO PETERS [DE]) [X] 6-10 * page 5, paragraphs 4-5 * * page 9, paragraph 5 * * page 10, paragraph 5 * * page 12, paragraph 6 * * page 13, paragraph 3 * * page 20, paragraph vorletzter - page 21, paragraph vorletzter * * page 22, paragraph 4 - page 23, paragraph 1 * * figures 9-12 * [A] 1-5; | [AD]EP1105067 (GIRRBACH DENTAL GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] * * figures 1, 4 * | by applicant | DE102008060504 | AT507887B | EP1105067 |