EP2463852 - Electrochromic Display Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yashiro, Tohru c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Hirano, Shigenobu c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Naijo, Yoshihisa c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Fujimura, Koh c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Murakami, Akishige c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Takahashi, Hiroyuki c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
Okada, Yoshinori c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11192077.3 | 06.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | JP20100273052 | 07.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010273052 | JP20110233927 | 25.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011233927 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2463852 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2463852 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/38, G02F1/15 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
G02F1/1347 (EP,US);
G02F1/153 (EP,US);
G02F1/163 (EP,US);
G09G3/38 (EP,US);
G09G2300/023 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2310/063 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0209 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrochrome Anzeigevorrichtung | [2012/24] | English: | Electrochromic Display Device | [2012/24] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage électrochromique | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2004017134 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-11,13 * page 3 - page 5 * * page 8 - page 9 * * figures 1, 3, 7 * [A] 12; | [IDA]JP2010033016 (RICOH KK) [ID] 1-5,9-13 * abstract * [A] 6-8; | [E]US2012050838 (HIRANO SHIGENOBU [JP], et al) [E] 1-5,9-13* paragraphs 43, 46, 51, 53, 77, 101, 118, 121, 124;; figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2007171781 | JP2008116718 | JP2008116665 | JP2010033016 | JP2010273052 | JP2011085773 | JP2011102288 | JP2011102382 | JP2011102287 | JP2011233927 |