EP2441447 - ENCAPSULATION OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Catchpole, Ian Richard GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
Gough, Gerald, Wayne GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
Papanicolaou, Irene GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Anna, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Harrison, Anna, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property 980 Great West Road (CN925.1) Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11192165.6 | 05.05.2009 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | US20080050775P | 06.05.2008 Original published format: US 50775 P | US20080074171P | 20.06.2008 Original published format: US 74171 P | [2012/16] | Previously filed application, date | WO2009EP55436 | 05.05.2009 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441447 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/51 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/0051 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61K9/5138 (EP,US);
A61K9/5153 (EP,US);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | AL | 06.12.2011 | BA | 06.12.2011 | RS | 06.12.2011 | Title | German: | EINKAPSELUNG BIOLOGISCHER WIRKSTOFFE | [2012/16] | English: | ENCAPSULATION OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AGENTS | [2012/16] | French: | ENCAPSULATION D AGENTS ACTIFS BIOLOGIQUEMENT | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/20] | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09742071.5 / EP2271323 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03005952 (CORIXA CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11,16,17,19 * page 2, line 20 - line 24; example -; claim - * [I] 4,12-15,18; | [A]US6284280 (WEITSCHIES WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 13 - line 21 * * column 3, line 6 - line 31 * * column 4, line 8 - line 26 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 17; examples 1, 3, 7; claim - *; | [A]WO9417789 (SHIELD RESEARCH LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-4; claims 1-5 10 11 * | [A] - VAUTHIER CHRISTINE ET AL, "Design aspects of poly(alkylcyanoacrylate) nanoparticles for drug delivery", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, DE, (20071201), vol. 15, no. 10, doi:10.1080/10611860701603372, ISSN 1061-186X, pages 641 - 663, XP008126608 [A] 1-19 * page 649, column left, line 29 - page 658, column right, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10611860701603372 | by applicant | WO2006029845 | US4833666 | US7250297 | US2007224633 | EP1641818 | US2004132028 | US2008139791 | WO2005056764 | US6818418 | WO2008098796 | WO2007068750 | WO2004014953 | WO2007113172 | WO0029004 | WO9958679 | WO2008149147 | WO2008149146 | - SAIJA A ET AL., J PHARM. PHA., (1990), vol. 42, pages 135 - 138 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, no. 1-2, pages 31 - 45 | - BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2000), vol. 1482, pages 337 - 350 | - PROTEIN ENG. DES. SEL., (2004), vol. 17, pages 455 - 462 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 1556 - 1561 | - EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (200706), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 909 - 917 | - J. BIOL. CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 24066 - 24073 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 332, pages 489 - 503 | - PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, no. 4, pages 1700 - 1705 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (2007), vol. 369, pages 1015 - 1028 | - PROTEIN ENG. DES. SEL., (2005), vol. 18, pages 435 - 444 | - EXPERT OPIN. BIOL. THER., (2005), vol. 5, pages 783 - 797 | - PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 15, pages 14 - 27 | - AI-LAZIKANI ET AL., JMB, (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948 | - MACCALLUM R.M.; MARTIN A.C.R.; THORNTON J.M, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 745 |