EP2461096 - Combustion head for low-nox liquid fuel burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riello S.p.A. Via Ing. Pilade Riello, 7 Legnago / IT | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchini, Nicola Via Ugo Foscolo, 23 37045 Legnago / IT | 02 /
Calzolari, Emil Via S. Pietro, 856 37040 Bevilacqua / IT | 03 /
Martini, Davide Via Boschetti, 14 37058 Sanguinetto / IT | 04 /
Visentin, Alessio Viale Stadio, 13 37040 Terrazzo / IT | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/23] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11192257.1 | 06.12.2011 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | IT2010BO00721 | 06.12.2010 Original published format: IT BO20100721 | [2012/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461096 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F23C7/00, F23D11/24, F23D11/40 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
F23C7/004 (EP);
F23D11/24 (EP);
F23D11/408 (EP);
F23D2900/00016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brennerkopf für einen Flüssigbrennstoffbrenner mit niedrigen NOx-Emissionen | [2012/23] | English: | Combustion head for low-nox liquid fuel burner | [2012/23] | French: | Tête de combustion pour brûleur à combustible liquide à faible émission de NOx | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 18.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1705424 (RIELLO SPA [IT]) [YD] 1-13 * column 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7 * * column 2, paragraph 14 - paragraph 15 * * column 2, paragraph 19 - column 4, paragraph 42 * * figures 1-7 *; | [YD]US4798330 (MANCINI ALFRED A [US], et al) [YD] 1-13 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 68 * * column 8, line 23 - line 38 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4105163 (DAVIS JR LEWIS BERKLEY, et al) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 31 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3979069 (GAROFALO LUIGI) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 24 - line 52 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP1705424 | US4798330 |