EP2450955 - Termination and contact structures for a high voltage GaN-based heterojunction transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose, California 95138 / US | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy, Michael 237 Oak Drive Middlesex, NJ 08446 / US | 02 /
Pophristic, Milan 62 Tee Ar Place Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2012/19] | Application number, filing date | 11192288.6 | 20.03.2008 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | US20070725823 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: US 725823 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2450955 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2450955 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L29/20, H01L29/205, // H01L21/316, H01L23/31 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
H01L29/7786 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02107 (KR);
H01L21/02378 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0242 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/3171 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/205 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/432 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02244 (EP);
H01L21/31683 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | Abschluss- und Kontaktstrukturen für einen Hochspannungs-Heteroübergangstransistor auf GaN-Basis | [2012/19] | English: | Termination and contact structures for a high voltage GaN-based heterojunction transistor | [2012/19] | French: | Structures de terminaison et de contact pour un transistor à hétérojonction à base de GaN à haute tension | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08732532.0 / EP2140493 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080732532) is 17.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03032397 (CREE LIGHTING CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * figure 1 * [I] 3,10-13; | [XI]US2005087763 (KANDA ATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 12B-C * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 82] , [ 154] , [ 167] * [I] 3,9-13; | [XI]US2006108606 (SAXLER ADAM W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figure 2B * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 58] , [0 60] , [0 69] * [I] 3,9-13; | [A] - ARULKUMARAN S ET AL, "STUDIES ON THE INFLUENCES OF I-GAN, N-GAN, P-GAN AND INGAN CAP LAYERS IN ALGAN/GAN HIGH-ELECTRON-MOBILITY TRANSISTORS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JP, (20050510), vol. 44, no. 5A, doi:10.1143/JJAP.44.2953, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2953 - 2960, XP001502490 [A] 3,13 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.44.2953 | [A] - HASHIZUME TAMOTSU ET AL, "Chemistry and electrical properties of surfaces of GaN and GaN/AlGaN heterostructures", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AVS / AIP, MELVILLE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010701), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1116/1.1383078, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 1675 - 1681, XP012008931 [A] 11,12 * figure 7 * * paragraph III.B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.1383078 |