EP2463042 - Assembly jig for pins for power transmission chain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fusayasu, Kouji c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kanemoto, Akihito c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11192515.2 | 08.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | JP20100275226 | 10.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010275226 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463042 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2463042 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B21L9/06, B21L19/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
B21L19/00 (EP,US);
B21L9/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Montageeinheit für Bolzen in einer Kraftübertragungskette | [2012/24] | English: | Assembly jig for pins for power transmission chain | [2012/24] | French: | Gabarit d'assemblage pour chaîne de transmission de puissance | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2011 | AL | 07.08.2013 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | HR | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | MK | 07.08.2013 | MT | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | SM | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | NO | 07.11.2013 | RS | 07.11.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | IE | 08.12.2013 | LU | 08.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 08.12.2011 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
RS | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 08.12.2011 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
RS | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 07.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2006095583 (JTEKT CORP) [AD] 1-3 * abstract *; | [AD]US7140173 (VAN ROOIJ JACQUES [NL]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006095531 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2009119507 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP1952907 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figures 4A,4B; claim 2 *; | [A]GB1261282 (MASSEY FERGUSON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 113 - page 3, line 33; figures 3-5 * | by applicant | JP2006095583 | US7140173 |