EP2437324 - Enhanced memory density resistance variable memory cells, arrays, devices and systems including the same, and methods of fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Jun 1033 S. Dale No. 203 Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/01] |
Former [2012/14] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11192542.6 | 06.08.2007 | [2012/14] | Priority number, date | US20060511311 | 29.08.2006 Original published format: US 511311 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437324 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2437324 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L45/00, H01L27/24 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H10B63/80 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/0004 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/068 (EP,US);
H10N70/20 (KR);
H10N70/231 (EP,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,US);
H10N70/8265 (EP,US);
H10N70/8418 (EP,US);
H10N70/8825 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | H01L45/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | Variable Speicherzellen mit erhöhter Speicherdichteresistenz, Arrays, Vorrichtungen und Systeme damit sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2012/14] | English: | Enhanced memory density resistance variable memory cells, arrays, devices and systems including the same, and methods of fabrication | [2012/14] | French: | Cellules de mémoire variable à résistance de densité de mémoire améliorée, réseaux, dispositifs et systèmes les incluant et procédés de fabrication | [2012/14] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07836539.2 / EP2062305 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070836539) is 04.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2007 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | IE | 06.08.2015 | LU | 06.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.08.2007 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.08.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.08.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.08.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.08.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 06.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1351253 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-19* figure 5 *; | [A]WO2005117026 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006110878 (LUNG HSIANG L [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,18,19 * figure 4 *; | [AP]US2007121369 (HAPP THOMAS [US]) [AP] 1-19 | by applicant | US20010853233 | US20010943190 | US20010941544 | US20010988984 | US20010022722 | US20020077872 | US20020081594 | US20020100450 | US20020121790 | US20020231779 | US20020230327 | US20030622482 | US20030663741 | US20040765393 | US20040796000 | US20040819315 | US20040865903 | US20040893299 | US20040899010 | US20050062436 | US20050193529 |