EP2468570 - Method for operating a lighting device of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichenecker, Thomas Sandäckerstr. 44 72070 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
Rauskolb, Dietmar Aaraustr. 45 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
Rosenstein, Filip Brunnenwiesen 25-B 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/09] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11192732.3 | 09.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | DE20101064220 | 27.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010064220 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468570 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468570 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q11/00, H05B37/03, H05B33/08 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B60Q11/005 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0088 (EP);
H05B45/50 (EP,US);
H05B45/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Beleuchtungseinrichtung eines Fahrzeugs | [2012/26] | English: | Method for operating a lighting device of a vehicle | [2012/26] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un dispositif d'éclairage d'un véhicule | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.04.2016 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2011 | AL | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | MT | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | RS | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 09.12.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
MT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.12.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.12.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005051212 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]EP2080667 (ASPOECK SYSTEMS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]DE102008047731 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * column 15 - column 25; figures 1,4 * |