EP2455881 - Automatic security action invocation for mobile communications device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2018/03] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Michael S 104 Hawkswood Drive Kitchener, Ontario NK2 4J4 / CA | 02 /
Adams, Neil 533 Falconridge Cresent Kitchener, Ontario N2K 4H9 / CA | 03 /
Fyke, Steven 3 Father David Bauer Drive Unit 401 Waterloo, Ontario N2L 6M1 / CA | 04 /
Little Herbert 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/03] |
Former [2012/21] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11193107.7 | 18.05.2007 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | US20060747588P | 18.05.2006 Original published format: US 747588 P | [2012/28] |
Former [2012/21] | US200674758806P | 18.05.2006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2455881 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2455881 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/30, G06F21/62, G06F21/88, H04L29/06, H04W12/02, H04W12/12, H04L9/00, H04W8/24, H04W12/08, H04W8/02 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G06F21/305 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06F21/88 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L9/00 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (US);
H04W12/082 (EP,US);
H04W12/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (US);
G06F2221/2143 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | Automatischer Sicherheitsaktionsaufruf für eine mobile Kommunikationsvorrichtung | [2012/21] | English: | Automatic security action invocation for mobile communications device | [2012/21] | French: | Invocation automatique d'actions de sécurité pour un dispositif de communications mobile | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07719821.6 / EP2021968 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070719821) is 11.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2007 | AT | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | IT | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | IE | 18.05.2018 | LU | 18.05.2018 | MT | 18.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
MT | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
MT | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1501330 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] *; | [I]US2005021468 (STOCKTON MARCIA L [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0034] - [0044]; figure 5; claims 8-11,18-20 * |