EP2466469 - Apparatus and method for dynamically reconfiguring state of application program in a many-core system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | For all designated states University Of Southern California 837 W. Downey Way, STO 306 Los Angeles, California 90089 / US | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states University Of Southern California 837 W. Downey Way, STO 306 Los Angeles, California 90089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Dong In USC Institute for Creative Technologies 12015 Waterfront Drive Playa Vista, CA California 90094-2536 / US | 02 /
Kang, Mi Kyung USC Institute for Creative Technologies 12015 Waterfront Drive Playa Vista, CA California 90094-2536 / US | 03 /
Lee, Jae Don Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Seung Won Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Shi Hwa Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11193126.7 | 13.12.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | KR20100127408 | 14.12.2010 Original published format: KR 20100127408 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2466469 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2466469 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/34, G06F9/50, // G06F9/44 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
G06F11/3433 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/20 (KR);
G06F8/76 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/44526 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | G06F11/34, G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur dynamischen Neukonfiguration eines Anwendungszustandsprogramms in einem mehrkernigen System | [2012/25] | English: | Apparatus and method for dynamically reconfiguring state of application program in a many-core system | [2012/25] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour reconfigurer dynamiquement l'état du programme d'application dans un système multi-cýurs | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2017 | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/12] | 16.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 16.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2854260 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2009037367 (WEIN DAVID [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US7734895 (AGARWAL ANANT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - SNELICK R ET AL, "SYNTHETIC-PERTURBATION TECHNIQUES FOR SCREENING SHARED MEMORY PROGRAMS", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE, WILEY & SONS, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, (19940801), vol. 24, no. 8, doi:10.1002/SPE.4380240802, ISSN 0038-0644, pages 679 - 701, XP000655467 [X] 1-15 * page 691 - page 692 * * page 685 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/spe.4380240802 | by applicant | KR20100127408 |