EP2468986 - Construction provided with a lateral bracing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | Moment frame connector | ||
[2018/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simpson Strong-Tie Company, Inc. 5956 W. Las Positas Blvd Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiriyur, Badri 372 South Caballo Street Mountain House, CA California 95391 / US | 02 /
Pryor, Steven E. 7864 Bristol Road Dublin, CA California 94568 / US | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/26] | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11193511.0 | 14.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | US20100967462 | 14.12.2010 Original published format: US 967462 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2468986 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2468986 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468986 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04H9/02, E04B1/24, E04H9/14 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
E04B1/2403 (EP,KR);
E04H9/024 (EP,KR);
E04H9/021 (KR);
E04H9/14 (EP);
E04B2001/2415 (EP,KR);
E04B2001/2418 (KR);
E04B2001/2442 (EP);
E04B2001/2445 (EP);
E04B2001/2448 (EP);
Y02A50/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | E04H9/02, E04B1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Konstruktion mit seitlichem Stützsystem | [2018/27] | English: | Construction provided with a lateral bracing system | [2018/27] | French: | Ossature avec système de renfort latéral | [2018/27] |
Former [2012/26] | Momentrahmenverbinder | ||
Former [2012/26] | Moment frame connector | ||
Former [2012/26] | Connecteur de trame de moment | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2011 | AL | 05.12.2018 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | IE | 14.12.2018 | LU | 14.12.2018 | MT | 14.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9831512 (ICF KAISER ENGINEERS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [XA]JP2000144901 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * [A] 10; | [A]US6073405 (KASAI KAZUHIKO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [IA]US2005257451 (PRYOR STEVEN E [US], et al) [I] 1-9,11-15 * figures 10-15 * [A] 10; | [XA]JP2005350906 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-9,11-15 * figures 1-7 * [A] 10; | [XA]EP1936053 (SIMPSON STRONG TIE CO INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028]; figures 1,2 * [A] 9,10 | Examination | JP2002371626 |