EP2608376 - Method for discharging an intermediate circuit capacitor of a sub-module of a power converter circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Völkel, Stefan Böhmlach 19 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11194179.5 | 19.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608376 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/36 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
B60L58/19 (EP);
B60L58/21 (EP);
H02M7/4835 (EP,US);
H02M7/49 (EP);
H02M1/322 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entladen eines Zwischenkreiskondensators eines Submoduls einer Stromrichterschaltung | [2013/26] | English: | Method for discharging an intermediate circuit capacitor of a sub-module of a power converter circuit | [2013/26] | French: | Procédé de décharge d'un condensateur de circuit intermédiaire d'un sous-module dans un circuit de convertisseur | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000116143 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1110773 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] *; | [Y]DE102007022515 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102008018258 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102010062119 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 3* paragraph [0033] *; | [YD] - LAMBERTZ LUKAS ET AL, "Modularer Hochfrequenz Umrichter fuer Fahrzeugantriebe", EMA 2010 - ELEKTROMOBILAUSSTELLUNG : FACHTAGUNG, WETTBEWERBE ; VORTRÄGE DER ETG-FACHTAGUNG VOM 8. BIS 9. OKTOBER 2010 IN ASCHAFFENBURG, BERLIN : VDE-VERLAG, (20101008), ISBN 978-3-8007-3311-8, pages 47 - 53, XP009158854 [YD] 1-15 * page 47 - page 50 * * figures 2,3 * | [Y] - ANNA MAYER ET AL, "Control Concept of the Modular High Frequency Converter for Vehicle Applications", PCIM,, (20110517), vol. Paper 92, ISBN 978-1-61839-061-5, pages 556 - 561, XP009159034 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |