EP2471980 - Method for producing silicon single crystal ingot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltronic AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hideo 1-5-13, Murozumi Hikari, Yamaguchi 743-0007 / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Hideaki 4-29-17, Nijigaoka Hikari, Yamaguchi 743-0031 / JP | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Staudacher, Wolfgang, et al Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Staudacher, Wolfgang, et al Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11194298.3 | 19.12.2011 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | JP20100293964 | 28.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010293964 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471980 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/06, C30B15/02 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
C30B15/00 (EP,KR,US);
C30B35/007 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Züchtungsverfahren für Siliziumeinkristall | [2012/27] | English: | Method for producing silicon single crystal ingot | [2012/27] | French: | méthode de production de monocristaux de silicium | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6284040 (HOLDER JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 *; | [XD]WO2009130943 (SUMCO CORP [JP], et al) [XD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]JP2010241620 (SUMCO CORP, et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1,3-4 *; | EP2267188 [ ] (SUMCO CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0048]; figures 1,4; claims 1-4 * | by applicant | JPH059097 | JP2002535223 | JP2007210803 |