EP2607678 - Fuel rail device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giovannetti, Massimo Via Frazzi 28 50018 Scandicci / IT | 02 /
Di Domizio, Gisella Via Mazzini, 56c 56019 San Giuliano Terme / IT | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11194590.3 | 20.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607678 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/00, F02M55/02, F02M69/46 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
F02M55/005 (EP);
F02M55/025 (EP);
F02M69/465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftstoffleistenvorrichtung | [2013/26] | English: | Fuel rail device | [2013/26] | French: | Dispositif de rail de carburant | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003127852 (USUI MASAYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0005]; figure 24 * * abstract * [I] 4; | [X]US6901913 (TSUCHIYA HIKARI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0037] , [0051]; figures 2b,5,10a * * abstract *; | [X]JP2007021508 (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102009051065 |