EP2434425 - Method and system for controlling access to digital content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 601 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jogand-Coulomb, Fabrice 32 Avenue Lilienne 13190 Allauch / FR | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11194684.4 | 26.03.2008 | [2012/13] | Priority number, date | US20070694866 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 694866 | US20070694868 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 694868 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2434425 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G11B20/00 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
G11B20/00818 (EP);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G11B20/00 (KR);
G11B20/00086 (EP);
G11B20/0021 (EP);
G11B20/00833 (EP);
G11B20/00847 (EP);
G11B20/10527 (EP);
G11B2020/10546 (EP);
G11B2020/10703 (EP);
G11B2020/10759 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Steuerung des Zugriffs auf digitale Inhalte | [2012/13] | English: | Method and system for controlling access to digital content | [2012/13] | French: | Procédé et système de contrôle des accès à un contenu numérique | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08744359.4 / EP2132677 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080744359) is 20.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1016948 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]WO2004008457 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2004028385 (KORI TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0199] *; | [A]EP1465426 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004250065 (BROWNING JAMES V [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035]; figures 7a,7b,8 * |