EP2480018 - Non-networked messaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palin, Arto Rantatie 39 37830 Viiala / FI | 02 /
Reunamäki, Jukka Peltomäenkatu 14 A 33820 Tampere / FI | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 11195136.4 | 22.12.2011 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | US201113012240 | 24.01.2011 Original published format: US201113012240 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2480018 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2480018 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/00, // H04W84/18 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (CN);
H04L51/04 (CN);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nicht vernetztes Benachrichtigungssystem | [2012/30] | English: | Non-networked messaging | [2012/30] | French: | Messagerie non réseautée | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 01.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0201814 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7-12 * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US2002175819 (JOO YOUNG-SEOUNG [KR]) [A] 1-4,7-12* paragraph [0024]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1416703 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,7-12 * paragraph [0048]; figure 4 *; | [X]EP1538791 (TDK SYSTEMS EUROP LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7-12 * the whole document * |