EP2608297 - Precious metal oxide catalyst for water electrolysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose-Schubert, Barbara Kaulbachstrasse 39 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Herein, Daniel Fritzlarer Strasse 10 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
Reitz, Hans-Georg Alte-Hohle 12a 63589 Linsengericht / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11195409.5 | 22.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608297 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/90, H01M4/92, C25B11/04 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/923 (EP,KR,US);
C25B11/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25B1/04 (KR);
C25B9/23 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/8652 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/881 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/9016 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/92 (KR);
H01M4/925 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Edelmetall-Oxidkatalysator für die Wasserelektrolyse | [2013/29] | English: | Precious metal oxide catalyst for water electrolysis | [2013/26] | French: | Catalyseur d'oxyde métallique précieux pour électrolyse de l'eau | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 12.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 22.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4457823 (LACONTI ANTHONY B [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12,13 * column 4, lines 36-43 * * column 9, lines 36-40 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 12 * * column 9, lines 18-23 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 14; | [A]JP2003293196 (ISHIFUKU METAL IND) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [YD]WO2005049199 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [YD] 9-11 * page 7, lines 11-26 *; | [A]JP2007012315 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2009162725 (TERAZONO SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0141] *; | [A]US2009186248 (YE SIYU [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0093] , [0096] * | by applicant | GB1195871 | JPH10273791 | US5861222 | US6309772 | US6500217 | US2003057088 | EP1701790 | - J OF APPL. ELECTROCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 31, pages 1179 - 1183 | - J OF ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 147, no. 6, pages 2018 - 2022 |