EP2458619 - Mass spectrometry with selective ion filtration by digital thresholding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibis Biosciences, Inc. 2251 Faraday Ave. Suite 150 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2017/28] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Ibis Biosciences, Inc. Suite 105 2251 Faraday Ave. Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFSTADLER, Steven, A. 1020 Park Hill Place Vista, CA 92081 / US | 02 /
HALL, Thomas, A. 5239 Wohlford Street Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | 03 /
SCHINK, Amy, L. 22 Brinks Ct. Sterling, VA 20165 / US | 04 /
DRADER, Jared, J. 6809 Camino De Amigos Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2012/35] | 01 /
HOFSTADLER, Steven, A. 1020 Park Hill Place Vista, CA California 92081 / US | ||
02 /
HALL, Thomas, A. 5239 Wohlford Street Oceanside, CA California 92056 / US | |||
03 /
SCHINK, Amy, L. 22 Brinks Ct. Sterling VA 20165 / US | |||
04 /
DRADER, Jared, J. 6809 Camino De Amigos Carlsbad, CA California 92009 / US | |||
Former [2012/22] | 01 /
HOFSTADLER, Steven, A. 1020 Park Hill Place Vista, CA California 92081 / US | ||
02 /
HALL, Thomas, A. 5239 Wohlford Street Oceanside, CA California 92056 / US | |||
03 /
SCHINK, Amy, L. 3256 Lincoln St. B. Carlsbad, CA California 92008 / US | |||
04 /
DRADER, Jared, J. 6809 Camino De Amigos Carlsbad, CA California 92009 / US | Representative(s) | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/31] |
Former [2012/22] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11196144.7 | 24.05.2005 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | US20040574042P | 24.05.2004 Original published format: US 574042 P | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458619 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458619 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/00, H01J49/02, H01J49/42, G01N33/68, H01J49/26, H01J49/16, H01J49/40 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
H01J49/0036 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
H01J49/0009 (US);
H01J49/0027 (EP,US);
H01J49/02 (US);
H01J49/165 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | H01J49/00, H01J49/02, H01J49/42, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2012/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Massenspektrometrie mit selektivem Ionfilter durch digitale Schwelle | [2012/22] | English: | Mass spectrometry with selective ion filtration by digital thresholding | [2012/22] | French: | Spectrométrie de masse avec filtration sélective d'ions par établissement de seuils numériques | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 30.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05753037.0 / EP1766659 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050753037) is 22.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2005 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.05.2005 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.05.2005 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6680476 (HIDALGO AUGUST [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AP]US6836742 (BREKENFELD ANDREAS [DE]) [AP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10152821 (BRUKER DALTONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20040943344 |