EP2610720 - Method and apparatus pertaining to the presentation of scrolling icons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gardenfors, Dan Zacharias c/o Research In Motion TAT AB SE-211 40 Malmö / SE | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 11196148.8 | 30.12.2011 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610720 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, H04M1/725 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (EP);
H04M1/724 (EP);
H04M1/72469 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Präsentation von Bildlaufsymbolen | [2013/27] | English: | Method and apparatus pertaining to the presentation of scrolling icons | [2013/27] | French: | Procédé et appareil relatifs à la présentation d'icônes de défilement | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2011 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/07] | 07.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/07] | Appeal following examination | 26.11.2013 | Appeal received No. T0554/14 | 27.01.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 10.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002160817 (SALMIMAA MARJA [FI], et al) [I] 1-3,5,8-10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] ** figures 1, 2, 3 *; | [X]US2006277490 (SAUERMANN VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0053] * * figures 3A-3C *; | [I]EP1777611 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 3, 6B, 6C *; | [I]US2009172562 (LAI LAI-CHEN [TW]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1, 2A, 2B, 3, 4 * |