EP2383925 - Method and apparatus for measuring symbol and bit error rates independent of disparity errors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tektronix, Inc. 14150 SW Karl Braun Drive P.O. Box 500, M/S 50-LAW Beaverton, Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tran, Que T 17122 SW Soren Court Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Clarke, Jeffrey, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield, Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2011/44] | Brinck, David John Borchardt, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250497.2 | 27.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | US201113084412 | 11.04.2011 Original published format: US201113084412 | US20100328876P | 28.04.2010 Original published format: US 328876 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2011/44] | US20110084412 | 11.04.2011 | |
US20100328876P | 28.04.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383925 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383925 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/24 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H04L1/244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2011/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen von Symbol- und Bitfehlerraten in Unabhängigkeit von Disparitätsfehlern | [2011/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring symbol and bit error rates independent of disparity errors | [2011/44] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour mesurer des taux d'erreur de symboles et de bits indépendamment des erreurs de disparité | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 28.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2013 | 30.04.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US7519874 (SALANT LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * figure 5 * * column 5, lines 37-60 * [A] 4-8; | [Y]US6892336 (GIORGETTA TIMOTHY E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * figure 9 * * column 15, line 34 - column 16, line 38 *; | [A] - HERZOG W, "Ein Bitfehlerstruktur-Messgerät für den Betrieb", TELEKOM PRAXIS, SCHIELE UND SCHOEN, BERLIN, DE, (19971101), vol. 74, no. 11, ISSN 0015-0118, pages 22 - 28, XP000884873 [A] 1-10 * page 3, column 2 - column 3 * * figure 2 * |