EP2393055 - Embedded communication system for refrigerated transportation containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minnepolis, MN 55420 / US | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walker, Timothy A. 4580 Ithaca Lane North Plymouth Minnesota 55446 / US | 02 /
Tan, Eduardo S. 763 Newberry Lane Chaska Minnesota 55318 / US | 03 /
Fink, Ulrich 9168 Norwood Lane North Maple Grove Minnesota 55369 / US | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 11250570.6 | 28.05.2011 | [2011/49] | Priority number, date | US20100791411 | 01.06.2010 Original published format: US 791411 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393055 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, H04L29/06 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
B60H1/00657 (EP,US);
B60H1/00771 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Eingebettete Kommunikationssystem für gekühlte Transportbehälter | [2011/49] | English: | Embedded communication system for refrigerated transportation containers | [2011/49] | French: | Système de communication intégré pour conteneurs de transport réfrigérés | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2015 | 29.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/27] | 26.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009293524 (VEZINA JEAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0 12] , [0 13] , [0 26] - [0031] - [0035] , [0 40] - [0043] *; | [I]WO2009088538 (TRACKING INNOVATIONS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0023] - [0054] , [0055] , [0059] , [0065] , [0066] , [0074] - [0108] *; | [I]US2005073406 (EASLEY LINDA G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 30] , [0 41] , [0056] - [0060] - [0064] - [0070] *; | [A] - L. RUIZ-GARCIA ET AL, "Review. Monitoring the intermodal, refrigerated transport of fruit using sensor networks", SPANISH JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH, (20070101), ISSN 1695-971X, XP055009204 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5424/sjar/2007052-234 | [A] - Harald Naumann, "Designing of mobile devices like playing with toys", Internet, (20071114), URL: http://www.roundsolutions.com/pdf/PR/Designing-mobile-devices.pdf, (20111012), XP055009356 [A] 1-15 * page 4 - page 6 * * page 16 * |