EP2434232 - Control of a transcritical vapor compression system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hegar, Michal Za Zameckem 746/3 15800 Prague / CZ | 02 /
Kolda, Michal Kettnerova 2056/12 155 00 Prague / CZ | 03 /
Kopecka, Marketa Okruzni 435 75501 Vsetin / CZ | 04 /
Rajtmajer, Vaclav Rovna 252/6 41501 Teplice / CZ | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250667.0 | 20.07.2011 | [2012/13] | Priority number, date | US20100888733 | 23.09.2010 Original published format: US 888733 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2434232 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2500/19 (EP,US);
F25B2600/17 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1931 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1933 (EP,US);
F25B2700/197 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2102 (EP,US);
F25B2700/21151 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuerung eines transkritischen Dampfverdichtersystems | [2012/13] | English: | Control of a transcritical vapor compression system | [2012/13] | French: | Contrôle de système de compression de vapeur transcritique | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |