EP2527846 - Aircraft wing blister [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states BAE Systems Plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellison, William Frank BAE Systems, Future combat Air Systems Warton Aerodrome Warton, Preston, PR4 1AX / GB | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11275088.0 | 26.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527846 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/16, G01P13/02, G01P1/02 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
G01P5/16 (EP);
B64D43/02 (EP);
G01P1/026 (EP);
G01P13/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flugzeugflügelwulst | [2012/48] | English: | Aircraft wing blister | [2012/48] | French: | Bosse d'aile d'avion | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP1255118 (ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC [US]) [ID] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0018] , [0028]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2008025931 (DASSAULT AVIAT [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs 2,3; figure 2 * * page 16, paragraph 3 - page 17, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP1918686 (FEDERALNOE GUP [RU], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025]; figures 12,16,18 * | [AD] - S.A.WHITMORE ET AL., "Application of a Flush Airdata Sensing System to a Wing Leading Edge", NASA TECHNICAL MEMORANDUM 104267, (199302), XP008144565 [AD] 1-15 * page 2, column r, paragraph 3 - page 3, column l, paragraph 2; figure - * | by applicant | US6550344 |