EP2485564 - Virtual femto gateway for connecting femto cells to a core network and corresponding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherubini, Davide 10 Fawn Lodge Castleknock Dublin / IE | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11290074.1 | 04.02.2011 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485564 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/16 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H04W88/16 (EP);
H04W84/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Virtuelles Femto-Gateway für die Verbindung von Femtozellen mit einem Kernnetzwerk und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2012/32] | English: | Virtual femto gateway for connecting femto cells to a core network and corresponding method | [2012/32] | French: | Femtopasserelle virtuelle pour connecter des femtocellules à un réseau central et procédé correspondante | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 28.02.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009055827 (STARENT NETWORKS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0097] * * figures 1, 32 * [I] 3-11,14; | [XI]US2010190496 (CHINNATHAMBI GOPINATH MURALI [IN]) [X] 1,2,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3-11,14; | [A]US2008271137 (SINN RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0052] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A] - JORDI PALET CESAR OLVERA CONSULINTEL DAVID FERNANDEZ UPM, "Forwarding Protocol 41 in NAT Boxes; draft-palet-v6ops-proto41-nat-03.tx", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20031001), no. 3, ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 13, XP015033636 [A] 1-15 * page 5, lines 5-19 * * Par. 6 * * fig. on page 5 * |