EP2487985 - Apparatuses and methods for transmission of a radio coverage request [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Thorsten Franklinstrasse 37 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11290078.2 | 09.02.2011 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487985 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP);
H04W36/322 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen für die Übertragung einer Anforderung für eine Funkversorgung | [2012/33] | English: | Apparatuses and methods for transmission of a radio coverage request | [2012/33] | French: | Procédés et dispositifs pour la transmission d'une demande de couverture radio | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005136911 (CSAPO JOHN S [US], et al); | [X]WO2008135231 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [XI]WO2010151186 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); |