EP2359681 - Device for cultivating plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Request for conversion to national application | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keller, Sacha Alexis 75 Bd de Brandebourg 94200 Ivry sur Seine / FR | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/34] | Application number, filing date | 11290087.3 | 15.02.2011 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2012/17] |
Former [2011/34] | FR20100000630 | 15.02.2010 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359681 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/02 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
A01G31/02 (EP,FI);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufzucht von Pflanzen | [2011/34] | English: | Device for cultivating plants | [2011/34] | French: | Structure pour la culture végétale | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 16.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 29.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/16] | 11.03.2014 | Request for conversion into a national application, for EE/ES/FI/IT/PL/PT/SK [2014/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4505066 (MOORE PATRICK D [CA]) [Y] 1-5,7,9-12 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2634971 (BLANC PATRICK [FR]) [Y] 1-6,10-12* page 1, line 17 - page 3, line 11 *; | [Y]US5862628 (TAKASHIMA YASUKAZU [US]) [Y] 1-6,9-12 * column 4, line 54 - column 63; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1519121 (AIR QUALITY SOLUTIONS LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-7,9-12 * column 2, lines 19-42 * * column 4, lines 16-27; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2431328 (HYDROLIGHT UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-12 * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 5; figure 1 * |