EP2541857 - Method to forbid an email from being forwarded or repleid to all [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 11290303.4 | 30.06.2011 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541857 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06Q10/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP);
H04L51/212 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verhindern der Weiterleitung oder der Allen-antworten-Funktion bei einer E-Mail | [2013/01] | English: | Method to forbid an email from being forwarded or repleid to all | [2013/01] | French: | Procédé pour interdire le transfert ou la réponse à tous d'un courrier électronique | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2013/23] | 27.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007168436 (ANDAM KENNETH [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] *; | [I]US2007226367 (CAI YIGANG [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * figures 2,3,5 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] *; | [A] - "METHOD FOR PRECLUDE UNAUTHORIZED SENDING OR FORWARDING OF MAIL ITEMS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19940301), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, page 199, XP000441437 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |