EP2490065 - A method for determining target optical functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Contet, Aude c/o Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-Le-Pont / FR | 02 /
De Rossi, Hélène c/o Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-Le-Pont / FR | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11305175.9 | 18.02.2011 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2490065 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
G02C7/028 (EP,US);
G02C7/06 (KR);
G02C7/02 (KR);
G02C7/025 (EP,US);
G02C7/027 (EP,US);
G02C7/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von optischen Zielfunktionen | [2012/34] | English: | A method for determining target optical functions | [2012/34] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer des fonctions optiques cibles | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 23.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1767983 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * figure 22 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0040] , [0042] , [0049] , [0051] , [0053] , [0054] - [0056] - [0062] , [0063] , [0071] *; | [X]WO2008086520 (ALCON RES LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-16 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2010017129 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-16 * claim 1 ** page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 22 *; | [X]EP2224276 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * figure 1A * * paragraphs [0069] , [0071] - [0077] - [0080] - [0082] - [0085] , [0091] - [0096] * * paragraphs [0000] , [ 0103] - [0104] - [0125] - [0139] * * table 2 * | by applicant | US6318859 | EP1752815 | - WILLIAM J.BENJAMIN, Borish's Clinical Refraction | - D CLINE; HW HOFSTETTER; JR GRIFFIN, Dictionary of visual science |