EP2525305 - Cabled condenser, in particular for a radiofrequency circuit and device comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lahoui, Nizar 34A - Résidence Jardin des Potiers 13400 Aubagne / FR | 02 /
Buyukkalender, Arek 15, rue Paul Preboist 13013 Marseille / FR | 03 /
Seban, Frédérick Bastide de l'Olivaie CD1 - Le Gibal 13260 Cassis / FR | [2012/47] | Application number, filing date | 11305595.8 | 17.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525305 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fadenkondensator, insbesondere für Funkschaltkreis, und diesen umfassende Vorrichtung | [2012/47] | English: | Cabled condenser, in particular for a radiofrequency circuit and device comprising same | [2012/47] | French: | Condensateur filaire notamment pour circuit radiofréquence et dispositif le comportant | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2011029757 (MICHALK MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 15 * * page 8, line 10 - line 16 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 2 * * page 24, line 14 - line 19 * * page 26, line 19 - line 27 * * figures 2-10 * [A] 5 [Y] 8-11; | [YA]DE4410732 (AMATECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 8-11 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 32 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-7,12; | [A]EP0704928 (HUGHES IDENTIFICATION DEVICES [US]) [A] 1-12 * line 31 - page 4, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US6378774 |