EP2575392 - Enhanced handover procedure in a E-UTRAN between Home eNodeBs (HeNBs) connected to a Home eNodeB Gateway (HeNB GW) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godin, Philippe Alcatel-Lucent France Centre de Villarceaux Route de Villejust 91620 NOZAY / FR | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 11306226.9 | 27.09.2011 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2575392 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W84/04 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H04W36/0011 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbessertes Übergabeverfahren in einem E-UTRAN zwischen an ein Home eNodeB Gateway (HeNB GW) angeschlossenen Home eNodeBs (HeNBs) | [2013/14] | English: | Enhanced handover procedure in a E-UTRAN between Home eNodeBs (HeNBs) connected to a Home eNodeB Gateway (HeNB GW) | [2013/14] | French: | Procédure de transfert améliorée dans un E-UTRAN entre des eNodeB domestiques (HeNBs) connecté à une passerelle eNodeB domestique (HeNB GW) | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 05.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010059100 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); |