EP2584754 - Method of managing a network of clients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foerster, Christopher Schwarenbergstrasse 175 70184 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Strauss, Thomas Jurastrasse 61 73734 Esslingen / DE | 03 /
Schreiber, Alexander Hartwaldstrasse 83 70378 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Kirchmann, Marc Zeller Strasse 15/1 73102 Birenbach / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 11306338.2 | 17.10.2011 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584754 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/24 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H04L41/0266 (EP);
H04L41/0843 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung eines Netzwerks aus Clients | [2013/17] | English: | Method of managing a network of clients | [2013/17] | French: | Procédé de gestion d'un réseau de clients | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003037128 (BEADLES MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] - [0061] *[I] 3,8,14; | [XI]EP1376930 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0024] , [0025] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0074]; figures 3-6 * [I] 3,11-13; | [XI]WO2006113238 (ESPRIDA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 10 * * page 11, line 20 - page 24, line 30 * * page 32, lines 12-18 * * figure 1 * [I] 12-14 |