EP2469649 - Radiofrequency antenna with multiple radiating elements for transmission of a wave with variable propagation direction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brasile, Jean-Pierre 160, Boulevard de Valmy BP 82 92704 COLOMBES / FR | 02 /
Tchoffo Talom, Friedman 160, Boulevard de Valmy BP 82 92704 COLOMBES / FR | 03 /
Sirot, Patrick 160, Boulevard de Valmy BP 82 92704 COLOMBES / FR | 04 /
Fasse, Dominique 160, Boulevard de Valmy BP 82 92704 COLOMBES / FR | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2012/26] | Application number, filing date | 11306778.9 | 26.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | FR20100005125 | 27.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1005125 | [2012/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469649 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469649 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/08, H01Q3/30, H01Q11/08, H01Q21/06 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H01Q3/08 (EP,US);
H01Q11/08 (EP,US);
H01Q21/067 (EP,US);
H01Q3/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H01Q3/01, H01Q3/04, H01Q3/14, H01Q3/32, H01Q11/08, H01Q19/06, H01Q21/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | Funkfrequenzantenne mit mehrfachen Strahlungselementen zum Aussenden einer Richtungswelle mit variabler Ausbreitung | [2012/26] | English: | Radiofrequency antenna with multiple radiating elements for transmission of a wave with variable propagation direction | [2012/26] | French: | Antenne radiofréquence à éléments rayonnants multiples pour émission d'une onde à direction de propagation variable | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 08.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.12.2011 | AL | 12.06.2013 | AT | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | HR | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MK | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | RS | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | SM | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | NO | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | IE | 26.12.2013 | LU | 26.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.12.2011 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MK | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
SM | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 26.12.2011 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MK | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
SM | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.12.2011 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MK | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
SM | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MK | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
SM | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
SM | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
SM | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.12.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
LU | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
RS | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2663869 (DONALD ADCOCK MACK, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3005983 (CHANDLER CHARLES H) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4427984 (ANDERSON ROY E [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 39 * * column 5, line 22 - column 7, line 43 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPH0677722 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0031] * * figures 5, 6, 9, 10 *; | [A]US6407714 (BUTLER DEREK A [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 2, line 8 - line 20 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 58 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1217686 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6552695 (STRICKLAND PETER C [CA]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 14 - column 8, line 17 * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]WO03043124 (EMS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 11 - line 19 * * page 11, line 4 - line 17 * * figures 2, 6 *; | [T] - E. Roubine, S. Drabowitch, C. Ancona, "Réseaux", Antennes, Paris, Masson, (19860101), pages 94 - 112, ISBN 978-2-22-580626-1, XP055003238 [T] 3 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6115005 | - LI, X.Q.; LIU, Q.X.; ZHANG, J.Q.; ZHAO, L.; ZHANG, Z.Q., "The high-power radial line helical circular array antenna: Theory and development", MICROWAVE AND MILLIMETER WAVE TECHNOLOGY (ICMMT), 2010, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (20100508), pages 671 - 674, XP031717245 |