EP2611070 - Method for establishing secure card history and audit for property hand-over [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girard, Pierre GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Maunier, Gérald GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2013/27] | Application number, filing date | 11306789.6 | 28.12.2011 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611070 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/08, H04W8/18, H04L29/06, H04W12/10 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04W8/28 (US);
H04L41/0869 (EP,US);
H04W12/10 (EP,US);
H04W12/35 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erstellung einer sicheren Kartenhistorie und -überprüfung zur Eigentumsübergabe | [2013/27] | English: | Method for establishing secure card history and audit for property hand-over | [2013/27] | French: | Procédé d'établissement d'histoire de carte sécurisée et audit pour transfert de propriété | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6968209 (AHLGREN KRISTINA [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 30 ** column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 21 *; | [I]US2007112882 (TYSOWSKI PIOTR K [CA], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2007207800 (DALEY ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0064] * |