EP2529966 - Variable and optimized aero-shape truck box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De la Torre San José, Rafael Av/Emilio Arrieta 8 Casa 16 28709 San Sebastian de los Reyes. Madrid / ES | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de la Torre San José, Rafael Ac/Emilio Arrieta 8, Casa 16. 28709 San Sebastian de los Reyes Madrid / ES | 02 /
Ribera Bodi, Jorge Manuel c/Colon 34 bajo 46290 Alcacer Valencia / ES | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 11380046.0 | 28.05.2011 | [2012/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2529966 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/16, B62D35/00 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
B60J5/125 (EP);
B60J7/1607 (EP);
B62D35/001 (EP);
B62D35/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LKW-Anhänger mit aerodynamisch variabler und optimierter Form | [2012/49] | English: | Variable and optimized aero-shape truck box | [2012/49] | French: | Remorque de camion à géométrie variable avec aérodynamique optimisée | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0498970 (HOOL NV [BE]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 2, lines 29-41 * * column 4, lines 33-55 * * figures 1,2,16-20 *; | [X]FR2477493 (HUGUET ROGER [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 2, lines 6-14 * * page 3, lines 5-9 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2779404 (PEREZ JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 6, lines 21-30 * * page 9, lines 5-13 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE20215675U (FAHRZEUGWERK BERNARD KRONE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2166392 (COOKS) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | ES2285889 | ES2345354T | US2010225143 | US2008309121 | CA2521840 | ES2318204T | CA2723882 | US2010231001 | US2008116716 | US6409252 | CA2358484 | US2002030384 | US5823610 | US5348366 | US4508380 | WO2010112467 | DE8810497U | GB2241205 | GB2360494 | US7261354 | EP1234715 | GB2166392 | GB2211795 | EP0132103 | US4392682 | ES2062904 | GB2265578 | EP20060725796 | EP20030813823 |