EP2487871 - Method and system for transmission of application status between different devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefónica, S.A. Gran Via, 28 28013 Madrid / ES | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia Puga, Javier Gran Vía, 28 28013, MADRID / ES | 02 /
Martinez Alvarez, Javier Gran Vía, 28 28013, MADRID / ES | 03 /
Perez Cubero, Roberto Gran Vía, 28 28013, MADRID / ES | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11382035.1 | 11.02.2011 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487871 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
G06F9/4856 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (EP,US);
G06F9/00 (EP,US);
H04L67/148 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Übertragung des Bewerbungsstatus zwischen verschiedenen Vorrichtungen | [2012/33] | English: | Method and system for transmission of application status between different devices | [2012/33] | French: | Procédé et système pour la transmission d'un état d'application entre différents dispositifs | [2014/47] |
Former [2012/33] | Procédé et système pour la transmission d'un statut d'application entre différents dispositifs | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005109829 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14* page 4, paragraph 32 - page 8, paragraph 29 *; | [XAI] - MICHAEL ADEYEYE ET AL, "A SIP-based web client for HTTP session mobility and multimedia services", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (20100517), vol. 33, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.comcom.2010.01.015, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 954 - 964, XP055002055 [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 8 [I] 3,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.comcom.2010.01.015 | [XAI] - MICHAEL ADEYEYE ET AL, "Control Services for the HTTP Session Mobility Service", NEW TECHNOLOGIES, MOBILITY AND SECURITY (NTMS), 2009 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091220), ISBN 978-1-4244-4765-7, pages 1 - 6, XP031613680 [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 8 [I] 3,10 | [XAI] - MICHAEL ADEYEYE ET AL, "Mapping Third Party Call Control and Session Handoff in SIP Mobility to Content Sharing and Session Handoff in the Web Browsing Context", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2009. WCNC 2009. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090405), ISBN 978-1-4244-2947-9, pages 1 - 6, XP031454294 [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 8 [I] 3,10 | [XAI] - Michael Adeyeye ET AL, "A SIP-based Web Session Migration Service", Proceedings of 5th International Conference on Web Information Systems and Technologies (WEBIST) 2009, Lisbon, Portugal, (20090323), URL: http://micadeyeye.files.wordpress.com/2009/01/a-sip-based-web-session-migration-service.pdf, (20110706), XP055002063 [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 8 [I] 3,10 | [A] - MCMANIS C, "Take an in-depth look at the Java Reflection API", 19970901, (19970901), ISSN 1091-8906, pages 1 - 7, XP002279291 [A] 8 * the whole document * | [A] - MICHAEL O. ADEYEYE ET AL, "Extending web browsers architectures to support HTTP session mobility", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2007 ACM CONEXT CONFERENCE ON , CONEXT '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070101), doi:10.1145/1364654.1364714, ISBN 978-1-59-593770-4, page 1, XP055002069 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1364654.1364714 | by applicant | US2006230076 |