EP2610637 - Proximity warning system for helicopters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS HELICOPTERS DEUTSCHLAND GmbH Industriestraße 4 86609 Donauwörth / DE | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Eurocopter Deutschland GmbH Industriestrasse 4 86609 Donauwörth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreitmair-Steck, Wolfgang Dr.Otto.Boessner-Weg 4 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
Waanders, Tim Hans-Mielich-Strasse 19 81543 München / DE | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associés 1330, Rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichauny, Bât B2 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | ||
Former [2013/27] | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2.9 - 1er Et. 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11400064.9 | 28.12.2011 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610637 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2610637 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/87, G01S13/93 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
G01S13/87 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/933 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2013/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Annäherungswarnsystem für Hubschrauber | [2013/27] | English: | Proximity warning system for helicopters | [2013/27] | French: | Système d'avertissement de proximité pour hélicoptères | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 12.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2011 | AL | 14.10.2015 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | MT | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | RS | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | IE | 28.12.2015 | LU | 28.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | GB | 14.01.2016 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4328573 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * * column 1, line 55 - line 60 * * figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]DE10015164 (KLAUSING HELMUT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1a, 1b *; | [Y]WO2007024635 (SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] ** figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4328573 | DE102006053354 | WO2011136707 |