EP2383416 - Curtain motor and control method for curtain motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griesser Holding AG Tänikonerstrasse 3 8355 Aadorf / CH | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winzeler, Markus Seegartenstrasse 10 8353 Elgg / CH | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 11405205.3 | 24.01.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | CH20100000605 | 27.04.2010 Original published format: CH 6052010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383416 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383416 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/68, E06B9/90, E06B9/32, G05B19/18 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
E06B9/68 (EP,CH);
E06B9/32 (EP);
E06B9/90 (EP);
G05B19/045 (CH);
G05B19/18 (EP);
G05B2219/45015 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | E06B9/68, E06B9/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2011/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Storenmotor und Steuerverfahren für Storenmotor | [2011/44] | English: | Curtain motor and control method for curtain motor | [2011/44] | French: | Moteur de stores et procédé de commande pour moteur de stores | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/12] | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1686438 (SOMFY SAS [FR]) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0040] - [0073] *; | [I]DE10357312 (ELERO GMBH ANTRIEBSTECHNIK [DE]) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] - [0037] - [0046] *; | [A]FR2879856 (SOMFY SAS [FR]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007055574 (TECHNIKU HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0913748 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |