EP2468161 - Construction element for making a shower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Group Nivelles NV Ambachtsweg 14 3890 Gingelom / BE | [2015/32] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Assenti-Lux S.A. Ëlwenterstrooss 26 9952 Drinklange / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nivelles, Geert Putstraat 36 3300 Hakendover Tienen / BE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Van hunsel, Lieven M.S. Archimedes Patents Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Van hunsel, Lieven M.S. Archimedes Patents P.O. Box 34 2900 Schoten / BE | Application number, filing date | 11447028.9 | 14.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | BE20100000758 | 23.12.2010 Original published format: BE 201000758 | [2012/26] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468161 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/40 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A47K3/405 (EP);
A47K3/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bauelement zur Herstellung einer Dusche | [2012/26] | English: | Construction element for making a shower | [2012/26] | French: | Elément de construction pour construire une douche | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202007015355U (SCHACO HANDEL AG [CH]) [X] 5,6* paragraph [0023]; figure 3a *; | [XY]DE202008011038U (FRANK HUSTER PROF FREIER ARCHI [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figure - * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]FR2917592 (DAVOUDI FARHOOMAN [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 62; figures 4-12 * [A] 1,4; | [A]DE202009004446U (SCHULTE DUSCHKABINEN [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202010003239U (HUSTER FRANK [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |